NJ A3917 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Forbids members of the State Investment Council from voting on transactions concerning investment with which a member has certain financial or familial conflicts and requires removal for violations thereof.
Title
Forbids members of the State Investment Council from voting on transactions concerning investment with which a member has certain financial or familial conflicts and requires removal for violations thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-08 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee | |
2011-12-05 | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) | |
2011-11-21 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2757 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee