NJ A3903 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows remote notarial acts during Public Health Emergency and State of Emergency declared by Governor in Executive Order 103 of 2020.
Title
Allows remote notarial acts during Public Health Emergency and State of Emergency declared by Governor in Executive Order 103 of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2336 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2336 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.26. |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-1) |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2336 |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Greenstein) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1) |
2020-03-23 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S2336 (Same As) 2020-04-13 - Substituted by A3903 (1R)