NJ A3902 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2293 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2293 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Securing Our Children's Future Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $1,000,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance certain school, school district, and county college capital projects; appropriates $5,000.*
Title
"Securing Our Children's Future Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $1,000,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance certain school, school district, and county college capital projects; appropriates $5,000.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S2293 (3R) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2293 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - Approved P.L.2018, c.119.