NJ S2293 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Approved P.L.2018, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Securing Our Children's Future Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $500,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance certain school, school district, and county college capital projects; appropriates $5,000.****

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Securing Our Children's Future Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $500,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance certain school, school district, and county college capital projects; appropriates $5,000.****

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Emergency Resolution Vote (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3902 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.119.
2018-08-27SenatePassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-0-0)
2018-08-27SenateMotion To Susp Rule 22:5 (65-0-0) (Benson)
2018-08-27SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2018-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Senate (31-0)
2018-08-27AssemblyEmergency Resolution (31-0) (Oroho)
2018-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (29-0)
2018-08-27AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-07-01SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1)
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2018-06-21AssemblySubstituted for A3902 (1R)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-05-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-04-12SenatePassed by the Senate (36-1)
2018-04-12SenateEmergency Resolution (36-0) (Oroho)
2018-04-12SenateSenate Amendment (35-0) (Sweeney)
2018-03-26SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Sweeney)
2018-03-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3902 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2293 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback