NJ A3890 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes motor vehicle penalty points for certain violations of "move over law"; establishes public awareness campaign; designated as "Slow Down or Move Over, It's the Law Act." **

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes motor vehicle penalty points for certain violations of "move over law"; establishes public awareness campaign; designated as "Slow Down or Move Over, It's the Law Act." **

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2019-11-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-05-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2501 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback