NJ A387 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases specialized care nursing facility beds for persons with Huntington's Disease. *
Title
Increases specialized care nursing facility beds for persons with Huntington's Disease. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for S1735 (SCS) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-23 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-23 | Passed by the Assembly (63-4-10) | |
2011-06-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1735 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by A387 (2R)