NJ A3869 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1364 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides funding from the General Fund to the Greater Wildwoods Tourism Improvement and Development Authority; appropriates $4 million.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides funding from the General Fund to the Greater Wildwoods Tourism Improvement and Development Authority; appropriates $4 million.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted by S1364 (2R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-28AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-05-07AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S1364 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback