NJ S1364 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides funding from the General Fund to the Greater Wildwoods Tourism Improvement and Development Authority; appropriates $4 million.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides funding from the General Fund to the Greater Wildwoods Tourism Improvement and Development Authority; appropriates $4 million.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3869 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-8)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (50-24-1)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A3869 (2R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-28AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3869 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1364 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback