NJ A3863 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3847
Note: Carry Over of previous A5726
Note: Carry Over of previous A5726
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various revisions to the Crime Victims' Bill of Rights.
Title
Makes various revisions to the Crime Victims' Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3847 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5726 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3847 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5726 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3863 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3863_I1.HTM |