NJ A3849 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.212.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.212.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to provide links to pricing information to customers from electric and gas public utilities, and third-party electric power and gas suppliers.*
Title
Requires BPU to provide links to pricing information to customers from electric and gas public utilities, and third-party electric power and gas suppliers.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2466 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2466 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.212. |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (64-0-0) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2466 (SCS) |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-2) |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeAngelo) |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeAngelo) |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2466 (Same As) 2015-10-22 - Substituted by A3849 (4R)