NJ A3841 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlords to count federal military service member and veteran housing allowances as income for purposes of qualifying for rental housing; designated as Securing Electronic Records for Veterans Ease Act.
Title
Requires landlords to count federal military service member and veteran housing allowances as income for purposes of qualifying for rental housing; designated as Securing Electronic Records for Veterans Ease Act.
Sponsors
Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Ryan Peters [R] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2447 |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2447 (Same As) 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.206.