NJ A3804 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.273.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.273.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes creation of special Omega Psi Phi license plate.
Title
Authorizes creation of special Omega Psi Phi license plate.
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Rep. John Amodeo [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Scott Rumana [R] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2864 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2864 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.273. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S2864 (1R) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2864 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A3804 (2R)