NJ A3803 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4157
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Substituted by S1445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Substituted by S1445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public institution of higher education to readmit student whose enrollment was interrupted due to military service.
Title
Requires public institution of higher education to readmit student whose enrollment was interrupted due to military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2025-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S1445 |
2025-01-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1445 (Same As) 2025-03-07 - Approved P.L.2025, c.33.
S4157 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S4157 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee