NJ A3769 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Substituted by S2059 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Substituted by S2059 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to ensure that fetal death certification and reporting requirements are consistent with current federal standards.
Title
Requires DOH to ensure that fetal death certification and reporting requirements are consistent with current federal standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Substituted by S2059 (2R) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2059 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.104.