NJ A3766 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.190.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public officer or employee to forfeit pension upon conviction for corruption of public resources, sexual contact, lewdness, or sexual assault when offense involves or touches upon public office or employment.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public officer or employee to forfeit pension upon conviction for corruption of public resources, sexual contact, lewdness, or sexual assault when offense involves or touches upon public office or employment.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2595 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.190.
2019-05-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-05-30SenateSubstituted for S2595 (1R)
2019-02-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-05-24AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Karabinchak)
2018-05-10AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2595 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A3766 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback