NJ A3758 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S1027 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S1027 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route No. 35 bridge between Brielle and Point Pleasant Beach as "Veterans of All Wars Memorial Bridge."
Title
Designates State Highway Route No. 35 bridge between Brielle and Point Pleasant Beach as "Veterans of All Wars Memorial Bridge."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S1027 (1R) |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1027 (Same As) 2015-01-06 - Approved P.L.2014, c.86.