NJ A3739 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.268.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.268.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public institutions of higher education to allow students, faculty, and other staff to identify sexual orientation and gender identity on any forms used to collect certain demographic data.
Title
Requires public institutions of higher education to allow students, faculty, and other staff to identify sexual orientation and gender identity on any forms used to collect certain demographic data.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3227 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.268. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S3227 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-7-13) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3227 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A3739 (1R)