NJ A3731 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S327
Note: Carry Over of previous A2284
Note: Carry Over of previous A2284
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes four-year pilot program in Ocean County for electronic monitoring of certain domestic violence offenders; designated as "Lisa's Law"; appropriates $2.5 million.
Title
Establishes four-year pilot program in Ocean County for electronic monitoring of certain domestic violence offenders; designated as "Lisa's Law"; appropriates $2.5 million.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1385 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S327 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2284 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S327 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2284 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3731 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3731_I1.HTM |