NJ A3731 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-09 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Schaer)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-09 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Schaer)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Certificates of Insurance Act."
Title
"Certificates of Insurance Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Rep. Jack Ciattarelli [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Schaer) |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2624 (Same As) 2013-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3731 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3731_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3731_R1.HTM |