NJ A3704 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies training requirements of certain HVACR contractors.
Title
Clarifies training requirements of certain HVACR contractors.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2550 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.99. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2550 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2550 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3704