NJ A3703 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.125.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.125.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises ownership standards and exemptions under HVACR license law. *
Title
Revises ownership standards and exemptions under HVACR license law. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2549 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2549 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.125. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-5-0) |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2549 (1R) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-3-3) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2549 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3703 (1R)