NJ A3701 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1525
Note: Carry Foward to future A3014
Note: Carry Foward to future S944
Note: Carry Over of previous A2273
Note: Carry Over of previous S2553
Note: Carry Foward to future A3014
Note: Carry Foward to future S944
Note: Carry Over of previous A2273
Note: Carry Over of previous S2553
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax credit to taxpayers that develop qualified native pollinator habitat on undeveloped property.
Title
Provides corporation business tax credit to taxpayers that develop qualified native pollinator habitat on undeveloped property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3701 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A3701 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A3701 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S81 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2273 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2553 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3701 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A3701 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S81 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2273 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2553 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3701 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3701_I1.HTM |