NJ A3659 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2420
Note: Carry Over of previous A2507
Note: Carry Over of previous A2507
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes tuition reimbursement program for certain advanced practice nurses who provide home health care services.
Title
Establishes tuition reimbursement program for certain advanced practice nurses who provide home health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1269 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2420 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2507 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2420 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2507 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3659 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3659_I1.HTM |