NJ A3601 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2099
Note: Carry Over of previous A5571
Note: Carry Over of previous S3817
Note: Carry Over of previous A5571
Note: Carry Over of previous S3817
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1028 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1028 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates Amistad Commission in but not of DOE; requires commission to elect chairperson and appoint executive director; requires public schools to include instruction on accomplishments and contributions of African Americans to American society.
Title
Allocates Amistad Commission in but not of DOE; requires commission to elect chairperson and appoint executive director; requires public schools to include instruction on accomplishments and contributions of African Americans to American society.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S1028 (1R) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3601 (Carry Over) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1028 (1R)
S1028 (Same As) 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.153.
A5571 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3817 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1028 (Same As) 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.153.
A5571 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3817 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading