NJ A3601 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns regulation of guaranteed asset protection waivers by DOBI.**
Title
Concerns regulation of guaranteed asset protection waivers by DOBI.**
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2209 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.82. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2209 (1R) |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2209 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A3601 (2R)