NJ A3562 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizes the form of disbursement for certain State and local government payments to individuals and business entities.*
Title
Modernizes the form of disbursement for certain State and local government payments to individuals and business entities.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-3-1) |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Ramos) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2424 (Same As) 2012-12-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee