NJ A3510 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJT to publish on website certain information concerning accessible transportation service routes.
Title
Requires NJT to publish on website certain information concerning accessible transportation service routes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |