NJ A3503 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5633
Note: Carry Over of previous S3974
Note: Carry Over of previous S3974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid coverage for remote stress tests for pregnant women.
Title
Requires Medicaid coverage for remote stress tests for pregnant women.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5633 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S3974 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2812 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3974 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2812 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3503 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3503_I1.HTM |