NJ A3501 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1027
Note: Carry Foward to future A3595
Note: Carry Over of previous S3372
Note: Carry Foward to future A3595
Note: Carry Over of previous S3372
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Agriculture in consultation with DOE to establish online applications for National School Lunch Program and school breakfast programs.
Title
Directs Department of Agriculture in consultation with DOE to establish online applications for National School Lunch Program and school breakfast programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3501 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3501 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1319 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3372 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3501 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1319 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3372 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading