NJ A3453 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes brain injury screening and education program in DCF.*
Title
Establishes brain injury screening and education program in DCF.*
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-15-6) |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3453 (Carry Over) 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee