NJ A3450 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2064
Note: Carry Foward to future S2397
Note: Carry Foward to future S2397
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (36-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (36-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates certain requirements for certain earned income access services and related provider contracts.
Title
Creates certain requirements for certain earned income access services and related provider contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3611 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3611 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S3611 (2R) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3450 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (36-1)
A3450 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (36-1)
S3611 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A3450 (5R)
A3450 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (36-1)
S3611 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A3450 (5R)