NJ A3433 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.237.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act"; authorizes executor, agent, guardian, or trustee, under certain circumstances, to manage electronic records of decedent, principal, incapacitated person, or trust creator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act"; authorizes executor, agent, guardian, or trustee, under certain circumstances, to manage electronic records of decedent, principal, incapacitated person, or trust creator.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.237.
2017-07-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-0)
2017-07-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-29SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2017-06-29SenateSubstituted for S2527 (1R)
2017-06-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-03-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2016-06-27AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mukherji)
2016-06-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2527 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A3433 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback