NJ A3426 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1398
Note: Carry Over of previous A3216
Note: Carry Over of previous A3216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects most State property to local property taxation beginning on July 1, 2022.
Title
Subjects most State property to local property taxation beginning on July 1, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1527 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1398 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3216 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1398 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3216 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3426 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3426_I1.HTM |