NJ A3424 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Approved P.L.2014, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Approved P.L.2014, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain laws governing police and fire interest arbitration; incorporates compounding in base salary calculation; extends two-percent cap on base salary awards.
Title
Revises certain laws governing police and fire interest arbitration; incorporates compounding in base salary calculation; extends two-percent cap on base salary awards.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.11. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |