NJ A3421 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.172.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.172.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the "Self-Funded Multiple Employer Welfare Arrangement Regulation Act."
Title
Revises the "Self-Funded Multiple Employer Welfare Arrangement Regulation Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2220 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2220 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2220 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2220 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.172. |
2015-12-07 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2015-12-07 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (62-0-0) |
2015-11-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2015-11-09 | Senate | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-0) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2220 (2R) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Singer) |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2220 (Same As) 2015-05-18 - Substituted by A3421 (2R)