NJ A3411 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Substituted by S2164 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Substituted by S2164 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from setting prices for non-covered dental services.
Title
Prohibits insurers from setting prices for non-covered dental services.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2164 (1R) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2164 (Same As) 2014-11-28 - Approved P.L.2014, c.70.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/A3411 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A3500/3411_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A3500/3411_R1.HTM |