NJ A3403 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1685
Note: Carry Over of previous A2180
Note: Carry Over of previous A2180
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Common Eastern Bumble Bee as New Jersey State Native Pollinator.
Title
Designates Common Eastern Bumble Bee as New Jersey State Native Pollinator.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3403 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2180 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2180 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee