NJ A3387 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S2227 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S2227 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires medical examiner training about sudden unexpected death in epilepsy and requesting decedent's medical information and brain donation for research.
Title
Requires medical examiner training about sudden unexpected death in epilepsy and requesting decedent's medical information and brain donation for research.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2227 (1R) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2227 (Same As) 2013-08-07 - Approved P.L.2013, c.91.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3387 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3387_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3387_R1.HTM |