NJ A3374 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S1571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S1571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route No. 71 bridge between Borough of Belmar and Borough of Avon-by-the-Sea as "Robert A. Briant, Sr. Memorial Bridge."
Title
Designates State Highway Route No. 71 bridge between Borough of Belmar and Borough of Avon-by-the-Sea as "Robert A. Briant, Sr. Memorial Bridge."
Sponsors
Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. Linda Stender [D] | Rep. Scott Rumana [R] | Rep. Robert Clifton [R] |
Rep. David Rible [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S1571 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1571 (Same As) 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.30.