NJ A3371 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Approved P.L.2013, c.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Protects minors by prohibiting attempts to change sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protects minors by prohibiting attempts to change sexual orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2278 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-19SenateApproved P.L.2013, c.150.
2013-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-9)
2013-06-27SenateSubstituted for S2278 (1R)
2013-06-24SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2013-06-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (56-14-7)
2013-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-10-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2278 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A3371

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback