NJ A3367 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3559
Note: Carry Over of previous A2679
Note: Carry Over of previous A2679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows gross income tax deduction for 50% of contributions of $100 or more to domestic violence shelters.
Title
Allows gross income tax deduction for 50% of contributions of $100 or more to domestic violence shelters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3367 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2679 (Carry Over) 2014-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1231 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2679 (Carry Over) 2014-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1231 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee