NJ A3356 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes central registry for sickle cell trait diagnoses; provides for informational outreach and genetic counseling.
Title
Establishes central registry for sickle cell trait diagnoses; provides for informational outreach and genetic counseling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-3-9) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2400 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee