NJ A3352 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved P.L.2013, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved P.L.2013, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Human Trafficking Prevention, Protection, and Treatment Act."
Title
The "Human Trafficking Prevention, Protection, and Treatment Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2239 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2239 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.51. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Pou) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (40-0) (Pou) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2239 (2R) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-10-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2239 (Same As) 2013-03-18 - Substituted by A3352 (4R)