NJ A3348 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain school security measures to be incorporated in architectural design of new school construction and certain school security measures for existing buildings.
Title
Requires certain school security measures to be incorporated in architectural design of new school construction and certain school security measures for existing buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2439 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, c.79. |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2439 |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2439 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by A3348 (1R)