NJ A3338 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4668

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Approved P.L.2017, c.242.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dedicates one percent of cigarette and other tobacco products tax revenues to anti-smoking initiatives.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicates one percent of cigarette and other tobacco products tax revenues to anti-smoking initiatives.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S862 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.242.
2017-12-07SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2017-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2017-07-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
2017-07-31Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2017-07-31AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2017-07-31AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2017-06-19SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S862 (2R)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-12-05SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-11-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-0)
2016-10-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-02-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S862 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A3338 (1R)
A4668 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback