NJ A3326 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S984
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S1676 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S1676 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows hospitals to construct housing and provide wrap-around services for individuals who are homeless or housing insecure.
Title
Allows hospitals to construct housing and provide wrap-around services for individuals who are homeless or housing insecure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S1676 (3R) |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3326 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S1676 (3R)
S1676 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.134.
S1676 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.134.