NJ A3312 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3256
Note: Carry Over of previous S273
Note: Carry Over of previous S273
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises age requirement of compulsory school attendance from 16 to 18 years old.
Title
Raises age requirement of compulsory school attendance from 16 to 18 years old.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3256 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S273 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2599 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S273 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2599 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3312 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3312_I1.HTM |