NJ A3279 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S2062 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S2062 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Deleware River Port Authority to use certain products manufactured in U.S.
Title
Requires Deleware River Port Authority to use certain products manufactured in U.S.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Substituted by S2062 (2R) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2062 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate