NJ A3274 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1479
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2826 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2826 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to offer cats and dogs no longer used for educational, research, or scientific purposes for adoption; designated the "Homes for Animal Heroes Act." *
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to offer cats and dogs no longer used for educational, research, or scientific purposes for adoption; designated the "Homes for Animal Heroes Act." *
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2826 (2R) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1479 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2826 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.414.
S2826 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.414.