NJ A3272 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Approved P.L.2011, c.65.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Approved P.L.2011, c.65.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipalities to reexamine municipal master plan every 10 years. *
Title
Allows municipalities to reexamine municipal master plan every 10 years. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Approved P.L.2011, c.65. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Substituted for S2433 | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-30 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) | |
2010-09-30 | Emergency Resolution (75-0-0) (Gusciora) | |
2010-09-30 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-20 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2433 (Same As) 2011-02-17 - Substituted by A3272 (1R)